Baxter v. Stephens et al
Plaintiff: Tye Baxter
Defendant: Shawn Stephens, Aaron Moody and Independence County
Case Number: 3:2021cv00241
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Marie Huffman Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Jamie Marie)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Independence County, Aaron Moody, Shawn Stephens.(Pearson, Allison)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Christine Pearson on behalf of Independence County, Aaron Moody, Shawn Stephens (Pearson, Allison)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tye Baxter. Independence County served on 12/21/2021. (Gillham, Lucien)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tye Baxter. Shawn Stephens (Official Capacity) served on 12/21/2021. (Gillham, Lucien) Docket text modified on 12/22/2021 to correct description. (kbc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tye Baxter. Shawn Stephens served on 12/21/2021. (Gillham, Lucien)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tye Baxter. Aaron Moody served on 12/21/2021. (Gillham, Lucien)
December 22, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Summons Returned Executed. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description to include "Shawn Stephens (Official Capacity) served on 12/21/2021" as indicated on the document. (kbc)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tye Baxter against All Defendants ( Fee $402, Receipt Number LIT084583). Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baxter v. Stephens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tye Baxter
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Stephens
Represented By: Allison Christine Pearson
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Moody
Represented By: Allison Christine Pearson
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independence County
Represented By: Allison Christine Pearson
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?