Tucker v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Paula Tucker
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2022cv00102
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Edie R Ervin
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Carillo on behalf of Social Security Administration (Carillo, Christopher)
May 3, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paula Tucker. Social Security Administration served on 4/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wallace, Stephanie)
April 25, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/25/2022. (jak)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk will issue Summons, without prepayment of fees and costs, to Plaintiff's counsel, who is responsible for service of the Complaint and Summons in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 4/14/2022.(jak)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Paula Tucker against Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Paula Tucker. (wbb)
April 14, 2022 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Tucker
Represented By: Stephanie Bartels Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Represented By: Christopher Carillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?