Lipford v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Randall Lipford
Defendant: Atrium Medical Corporation and Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00110
Filed: May 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2022 Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/5/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/19/2022; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 4/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 05/05/2022. (tmw)
May 5, 2022 Filing 12 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales LLC. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Provencher, Scott)
May 5, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Atrium Medical Corporation. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Provencher, Scott)
May 5, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Atrium Medical Corporation (Provencher, Scott)
May 5, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales LLC (Provencher, Scott)
May 5, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Atrium Medical Corporation (Provencher, Scott)
May 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Provencher on behalf of Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales LLC (Provencher, Scott)
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn A. Pryor on behalf of Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales LLC (Pryor, Kathryn)
May 4, 2022 Filing 5 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #1 Notice of Removal notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (cmn)
May 3, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales LLC. (jbh)
May 3, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Atrium Medical Corporation. (jbh)
May 3, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Randall Lipford. (jbh)
May 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Izard County Circuit Court, case number 33CV-22-00020. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT086597. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipford v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Lipford
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: L. Gray Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atrium Medical Corporation
Represented By: Kathryn A. Pryor
Represented By: Scott D. Provencher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales LLC
Represented By: Kathryn A. Pryor
Represented By: Scott D. Provencher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?