Monahan v. Red Mule Express LLC
Plaintiff: Richard Monahan
Defendant: Red Mule Express LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00129
Filed: May 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/6/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/19/2022; Bench Trial proposed for sometime during the week of 1/22/2024 at 9:30 a.m. in Jonesboro Courtroom #324 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/28/2022. (ljb)
June 27, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Red Mule Express LLC.(Steele, Larry)
June 27, 2022 Filing 4 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #3 Answer lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (jak)
June 27, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Red Mule Express LLC.(jak)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Monahan. Red Mule Express LLC served on 6/6/2022. (Sanford, Joshua)
May 26, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include, "Summons issued and returned to counsel for service." (cmn)
May 25, 2022 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against Red Mule Express LLC, filed by Richard Monahan. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT086877.) Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Docket text modified on 5/26/2022 to indicate summons issued.)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monahan v. Red Mule Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Monahan
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Laura Edmondson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Mule Express LLC
Represented By: Larry J. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?