Collard v. New York Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Charles Collard
Defendant: New York Life Insurance Company, Life Insurance Company of North America and Magnitude 7 Metals LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00136
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2022 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Life Insurance Company of North America (Brodzik, James)
July 27, 2022 Filing 18 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #17 Answer notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak)
July 26, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Brodzik, James)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Doc. #11 & #13 , granted. James M. Brodzik and Daniel K. Ryan are admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/19/2022. (slb)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Stipulation, Doc. #8 , noted. New York Life Insurance Company and Magnitude 7 Metals, LLC are dismissed without prejudice. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(l)(A)(i). Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/18/2022. (jak)Notice: The terminated party will no longer receive filing notifications through CM/ECF. To continue receiving filing notifications, #email the Clerk of Court and request reinstatement. Please refer to the CM/ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures for Civil Filings for information about when a terminated party must be served.
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, Doc. #10 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due 27 July 2022. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/13/2022. (jak)
July 12, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Daniel K. Ryan. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4305352. Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America (Williams, Aylmer)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, Doc. #6 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due 12 August 2022. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/12/2022. (jak)
July 12, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by James M. Brodzik. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4305252. Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America (Williams, Aylmer)
July 12, 2022 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America (Williams, Aylmer)
July 12, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Aylmer Gene Williams on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Williams, Aylmer)
July 12, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal of New York Life Insurance Company and Magnitude 7 Metals, LLC by Charles Collard. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 12, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Charles Collard. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 6/27/2022. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 11, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Magnitude 7 Metals LLC (Zorn, Stephanie)
July 11, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Magnitude 7 Metals LLC (Zorn, Stephanie)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, Doc. #3 , granted. Stephanie O. Zorn is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/1/2022. (slb)
June 30, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Stephanie O. Zorn. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4297860. Filed by Magnitude 7 Metals LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Barron, Sally)
June 30, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally F. Barron on behalf of Magnitude 7 Metals LLC (Barron, Sally)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Charles Collard. Fee $402; Receipt No. LIT087103. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collard v. New York Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Collard
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel K. Ryan
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Aylmer Gene Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnitude 7 Metals LLC
Represented By: Sally F. Barron
Represented By: Stephanie O. Zorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?