Trullinger v. Jonesboro Arkansas, City of
Plaintiff: Laura Trullinger
Defendant: Jonesboro, City of and Jonesboro Arkansas, City of
Case Number: 3:2022cv00137
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Jonesboro Arkansas, City of.(Adams, Jenna)
July 5, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Adams on behalf of Jonesboro Arkansas, City of (Adams, Jenna)
June 13, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party name as "Jonesboro Arkansas, City of" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against Jonesboro Arkansas, City of filed by Laura Trullinger. Fee $402; Receipt No. JON001095. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (wbb) (Docket text modified on 6/10/2022 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak) (Docket text modified on 6/13/2022 to correct party name.)(cmn)
June 10, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT" as marked on the document. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trullinger v. Jonesboro Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Trullinger
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonesboro, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonesboro Arkansas, City of
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?