Engles et al v. ARcare
Plaintiff: Jacquita Engles and Jeffery Engles
Defendant: ARcare
Case Number: 3:2022cv00139
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2022 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand by Jacquita Engles, Jeffery Engles (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply In Support of Motion to Remand)(Parkhill, Anthony)
August 8, 2022 Filing 45 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Lisa A. White re 15 Text Entry Only Order, 24 Text Entry Only Order. (fjg)
August 8, 2022 Filing 44 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Danielle L. Perry re 15 Text Entry Only Order, 24 Text Entry Only Order. (fjg)
August 8, 2022 Filing 43 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Gary E. Mason re 15 Text Entry Only Order, 24 Text Entry Only Order. (fjg)
August 4, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea L. Kleinhenz on behalf of ARcare (Kleinhenz, Andrea)
August 3, 2022 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ARcare. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Irby, Scott)
August 3, 2022 Filing 40 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Anthony L Parkhill re Notice of Docket Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. Resent to updated address. (fjg)
August 2, 2022 Filing 39 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Anthony L Parkhill re 20 Text Entry Only Order. Resent to updated address. (fjg)
August 2, 2022 Filing 38 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Ben Barnow re 20 Text Entry Only Order. (fjg)
August 2, 2022 Filing 37 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Riley W. Prince re 20 Text Entry Only Order. (fjg)
August 1, 2022 Filing 36 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Riley W. Prince re Notice of Docket Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. (fjg)
August 1, 2022 Filing 35 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Lisa A. White re #6 Order of Transfer, 7 Text Entry Only Notice of Reassignment. (fjg)
August 1, 2022 Filing 34 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Lisa A. White re Notice of Docket Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. (fjg)
August 1, 2022 Filing 33 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Gary E. Mason re #6 Order of Transfer, 7 Text Entry Only Notice of Reassignment. (fjg)
August 1, 2022 Filing 32 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Gary E. Mason re Notice of Docket Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. (fjg)
August 1, 2022 Filing 31 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Danielle L. Perry re #6 Order of Transfer, 7 Text Entry Only Notice of Reassignment. (fjg)
August 1, 2022 Filing 30 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Danielle L. Perry re Notice of Docket Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. (fjg)
July 27, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Sidney Freedus on behalf of ARcare (Freedus, Matthew)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Response due by 8/3/2022. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/26/2022. (rmg)
July 26, 2022 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court by ARcare (Irby, Scott)
July 21, 2022 Filing 26 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Anthony L Parkhill re 15 Text Entry Only Order. Resent to updated address. (fjg)
July 21, 2022 Filing 25 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Ben Barnow re 15 Text Entry Only Order. Resent to updated address. (fjg)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #21 motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Anthony L. Parkhill. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/21/2022. (ljb)
July 20, 2022 Filing 23 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Riley W. Prince re 15 Order. (jbh)
July 20, 2022 Filing 22 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Ben Barnow re 6/15/2022 Notice of Docket Correction. (jbh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Anthony L. Parkhill. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4310349. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Daniels, Shawn)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #19 motion to withdraw as attorney filed by ARcare. Attorney Laura E. Bates terminated. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/19/2022. (ljb)
July 18, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ARcare (Bates, Laura)
July 13, 2022 Filing 18 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #17 Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Daniels, Shawn)
July 13, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs (Daniels, Shawn)
July 11, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #10 Mail Returned. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (lack of file mark) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #10 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #14 motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Matthew S. Freedus. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/11/2022. (ljb)
July 8, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Matthew S. Freedus. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4302509. Filed by ARcare (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Irby, Scott)
July 8, 2022 Filing 13 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Anthony L. Parkhill re #3 Deficiency Letter, #6 Order, 7 Notice of Reassignment. (jbh)
July 8, 2022 Filing 12 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Riley W. Prince re #6 Order, 7 Notice of Reassignment. (jbh)
July 8, 2022 Filing 11 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Lisa A. White re #3 Deficiency Letter. (jbh)
July 8, 2022 Filing 10 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Danielle L. Perry re #3 Deficiency Letter. (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2022: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
July 8, 2022 Filing 9 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Gary E. Mason re #3 Deficiency Letter. (jbh)
June 30, 2022 Filing 8 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Riley W. Prince re #3 Deficiency Letter. (fjg)
June 21, 2022 Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to #6 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER directing the Clerk to reassign this case to Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 6/21/2022. (jak)
June 20, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by ARcare Notice of Stay (Marts, Gary)
June 15, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the Woodruff County Circuit Court case number as "CV-22-43" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by ARcare (Bates, Laura)
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of the Court re #1 Notice of Removal, notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (ldb)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jacquita Engles and Jeffery Engles against ARcare. (ldb)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ARcare from Woodruff County Circuit Court, case number 74CV-22-43. Fee $402, receipt number LIT087137. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engles et al v. ARcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquita Engles
Represented By: Anthony L. Parkhill
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Danielle L. Perry
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Represented By: Riley W. Prince
Represented By: Shawn Bradley Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Engles
Represented By: Anthony L. Parkhill
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Danielle L. Perry
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Represented By: Riley W. Prince
Represented By: Shawn Bradley Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARcare
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Laura E. Bates
Represented By: Matthew S. Freedus
Represented By: Scott Andrew Irby
Represented By: Matthew Sidney Freedus
Represented By: Andrea L. Kleinhenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?