Whitkanack v. ARcare
Plaintiff: Michael Whitkanack
Defendant: ARcare
Case Number: 3:2022cv00140
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea L. Kleinhenz on behalf of ARcare (Kleinhenz, Andrea)
July 27, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Sidney Freedus on behalf of ARcare (Freedus, Matthew)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 motion to withdraw as attorney filed by ARcare. Attorney Laura E. Bates terminated. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/19/2022. (ljb)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Matthew S. Freedus. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/19/2022. (ljb)
July 18, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ARcare (Bates, Laura)
July 8, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Matthew S. Freedus. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4302491. Filed by ARcare (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Irby, Scott)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to transfer this case to the Honorable Brian S. Miller. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/8/2022. (jbh)
July 8, 2022 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #6 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
July 5, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases with Incorporated Brief in Support by Michael Whitkanack (Gates, Joseph)
June 23, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Notice to Stay. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the filing event as "MOTION to Stay" pursuant to instruction from Chambers. (jak)
June 20, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay by ARcare. (Marts, Gary) (Docket entry modified on 6/23/2022 to correct the filing event pursuant to instruction from Chambers) (jak)
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by ARcare (Bates, Laura)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ARcare, filed by Michael Whitkanack. (jbh)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ARcare from Woodruff County Circuit Court, case number CV-22-00046. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT087138. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitkanack v. ARcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Whitkanack
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Kevin Leddy
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Represented By: Tyler Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARcare
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Laura E. Bates
Represented By: Matthew S. Freedus
Represented By: Scott Andrew Irby
Represented By: Matthew Sidney Freedus
Represented By: Andrea L. Kleinhenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?