Marshall v. Brown
Plaintiff: Larry Marshall, Jr
Defendant: Jonathan Brown, Mississippi County Sheriff's Department and Mississippi County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2022cv00273
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Northern Division Office
Presiding Judge: Edie R Ervin
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2022 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to #2 Complaint and #6 Supplement filed by Larry Marshall, Jr. (llg)
November 18, 2022 Summons Issued as to Jonathan Brown and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ldb)
November 17, 2022 Filing 8 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending Mr. Marshall's claims against the Sheriff's Department and the Detention Center be dismissed without prejudice based on his failure to state a plausible constitutional claim for relief; the Clerk be instructed to terminate the Sheriff's Department and the Detention Center as party Defendants #2 ; Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 11/17/22. (tjb)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Defendant Jonathan Brown. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve Defendant Brown with a summons and a copy of the #2 complaint and #6 supplement to the complaint (with any attachments) without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. #5 Motion for appointment of counsel is denied, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 11/17/2022. (jak)
November 14, 2022 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #2 Complaint filed by Larry Marshall, Jr. (llg)
November 14, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Larry Marshall, Jr. (llg)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER giving Mr. Marshall 30 days to file a supplement to his complaint clarifying the type of relief that he seeks from the Court. If Mr. Marshall fails to file a supplement to his complaint, the Court will screen his original complaint, which is likely to result in the dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/25/2022. (jak)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will assess an initial partial payment of $6.90. Plaintiff's custodians are directed to collect the initial fee and forward that amount along with future monthly payments to the Clerk of the Court until the entire $350 filing fee is paid. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Mississippi County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/25/2022. (jak)
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Jonathan Brown, filed by Larry Marshall, Jr.(kdr)
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Marshall, Jr. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Marshall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?