Brown v. Laddner et al
Plaintiff: Rickey Brown
Defendant: Cody Laddner, Taylor Igleheart, Jason Allen and Chris Lane
Case Number: 3:2023cv00036
Filed: February 6, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rickey Brown. (kdr)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mr. Brown must within 30 days of the date of this Order either pay the $402.00 filing fee in full or file a properly completed application to proceed IFP for the Court's review and consideration. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to send Mr. Brown a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis, including a certificate and calculation sheet. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/13/2023. (jak)
February 6, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rickey Brown. (ldb)
February 6, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rickey Brown. (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Laddner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Laddner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Igleheart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?