Collard v. New York Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Charles Collard
Defendant: New York Life Insurance Company, Life Insurance Company of North America and Magnitude 7 Metals LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00187
Filed: September 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Brodzik, James)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER adopting the #5 stipulation of dismissal and dismissing without prejudice all claims against defendants New York Life Insurance Company and Magnitude 7 Metals LLC; the claims against defendant Life Insurance Company of North America remain pending. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/23/2023. (jak)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 consent motion for extension of time; and extending the time for defendant Life Insurance Company of North America to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint to, and including, 10/25/2023. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/10/2023. (jbh)
October 9, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by James Brodziak. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4614845. Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America (Williams, Aylmer)
October 9, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Daniel Ryan. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4614844. Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America (Williams, Aylmer)
October 9, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Life Insurance Company of North America (Williams, Aylmer)
October 9, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Aylmer Gene Williams on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Williams, Aylmer)
October 5, 2023 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal of New York Life Insurance Company and Magnitude 7 Metals, LLC by Charles Collard. (Lacy, Brandon)
September 25, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Charles Collard. Magnitude 7 Metals LLC served on 9/19/2023. (Lacy, Brandon)
September 25, 2023 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Charles Collard. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 9/20/2023. (Lacy, Brandon)
September 25, 2023 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Charles Collard. New York Life Insurance Company served on 9/20/2023. (Lacy, Brandon)
September 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Charles Collard. (Fee of $402. Receipt Number LIT3562. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collard v. New York Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Collard
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel K. Ryan
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Aylmer Gene Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnitude 7 Metals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?