Diaz v. Poinsett County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Henry Diaz
Defendant: Poinsett County Detention Center, B J Carter, Regina Hindman, Carlie Douglas and Gunner Weeks
Case Number: 3:2023cv00207
Filed: October 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Northern Division Office
Presiding Judge: Edie R Ervin
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Henry Diaz. (wbb)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 motion for leave to proceed IFP; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Poinsett County Detention Center and the appropriate ADC offices; allowing Mr. Diaz to file a second amended complaint within 30 days of the entry of this Order; directing the Clerk to send Mr. Diaz a blank 1983 complaint form along with a copy of this Order; and instructing the Clerk to terminate the Poinsett County Detention Center as a party defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 11/17/2023. (jak)
November 14, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Henry Diaz. (ldb)
November 14, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Henry Diaz. (ldb)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk to mail plaintiff a new IFP application along with a copy of this Order; plaintiff must return a completed IFP application or pay the $402 filing fee within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/11/2023. (jak)
October 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Poinsett County Detention Center, filed by Henry Diaz. (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Poinsett County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poinsett County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B J Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Hindman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlie Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunner Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?