Richardson v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Richardson
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2024cv00058
Filed: April 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Suermann Jr. on behalf of Jeffrey Richardson (Wolff, Nelson)(Docket text modified on 5/30/2024 to correct the attorney entering appearance) (jak)
May 30, 2024 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the attorney entering appearance as John Suermann Jr. as marked on the document. (jak)
May 10, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks E. Kostakis on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Kostakis, Brooks)
May 10, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Camille Reifers on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Reifers, Stephanie)
May 10, 2024 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by BNSF Railway Company (Reifers, Stephanie)
May 10, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Defenses to Complaint by BNSF Railway Company.(Reifers, Stephanie)
April 25, 2024 Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #3 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to randomly reassign this case to another district judge. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/24/2024. (ljb)
April 23, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Richardson. BNSF Railway Company served on 4/19/2024. (Wolff, Nelson)
April 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BNSF Railway Company filed by Jeffrey Richardson. Fee $405; Receipt No. JON265. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Richardson
Represented By: Nelson Gregory Wolff
Represented By: John R. Suermann, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Stephanie Camille Reifers
Represented By: Brooks E. Kostakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?