Benjamin v. Zamora et al
Plaintiff: Guy Wesson Benjamin
Defendant: Luis Zamora and Landstar Inway Inc
Case Number: 3:2025cv00033
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2025 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/29/2025; Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/13/2025. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 6/22/2026 at 9:15 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom 324 before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/27/2025. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
February 24, 2025 Filing 7 JOINDER by Luis Zamora to #1 Notice of Removal, #6 Affidavit of Service. DEFENDANT LUIS ZAMORAS CONFIRMATION OF PRIOR JOINDER IN REMOVAL (Wardlaw, John)
February 21, 2025 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Guy Wesson Benjamin. Luis Zamora served on 2/21/2025. (Curry, Lee)
February 20, 2025 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS OF LANDSTAR INWAY, INC. AND LUIS ZAMORA by Landstar Inway Inc (Wardlaw, John)
February 20, 2025 Filing 4 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #3 Answer notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak)
February 18, 2025 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Luis Zamora, Landstar Inway Inc.(jak)
February 18, 2025 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Guy Wesson Benjamin.(jak)
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 JOINT NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Luis Zamora, Landstar Inway Inc from Crittenden County Circuit Court, case number 18CV-25-57. (Fee of $ 405; receipt number JON380) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin v. Zamora et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Wesson Benjamin
Represented By: Lee Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Zamora
Represented By: John Lewis Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landstar Inway Inc
Represented By: John Lewis Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?