Westerfield, et al v. Armstrong World Ind, et al

Plaintiff: William Dale Melton
Defendant: Keene Corporation, Garlock Inc, H K Porter Company Inc and John Crane Inc
Case Number: 4:1991cv00056
Filed: January 28, 1991
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: District Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER NO. 387. Signed by Judge Eduardo C. Robreno on 4/13/2009.(bkp)
April 13, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 79 (Notice) MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Dale Melton; case is dismissed pursuant to FRcvP 41(a)(2). Signed by Judge Eduardo C. Robreno. (mkf)
March 24, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting hearing on defts' motion for a rule to show cause for Tuesday, April 7, 2009 at 9:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Eduardo C. Robreno on 3/24/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westerfield, et al v. Armstrong World Ind, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dale Melton
Represented By: Kathryn A. Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keene Corporation
Represented By: Richard L. Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garlock Inc
Represented By: Tom F. Lovett (DECEASED)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H K Porter Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc
Represented By: Roger A. Glasgow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?