Shelton v. Kennedy Funding Inc

Plaintiff: Virgil W Shelton
Defendant: Kennedy Funding Inc
Case Number: 4:2002cv00632
Filed: October 9, 2002
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2010 261 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Virgil W Shelton against Kennedy Funding Inc in the amount of $675,000.00 plus pre-judgment interest at the rate of 6% and post-judgment interest at the rate of.72% per annum until paid re 201 Jury Verdict, 258 USCA Opinion. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/27/10. (bkp) Modified on 10/28/2010 to correct typographical error (bkp).
June 30, 2009 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 244 Trinity's Motion to Intervene; Denying as Moot 246 Trinity's Motion to Modify Protective Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/30/09. (dac)
June 12, 2009 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 239 Motion to Alter Judgment; granting 240 Motion for Approval of Supersedeas Bond and to Stay Execution Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/12/09. (dac)
June 9, 2009 249 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER regarding plaintiff's calculations as to the amount of the Supersedeas Bond; reply is due by 2:00 p.m. on June 10, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/9/09. (mkf)
May 7, 2009 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 215 Motion for Attorney Fees; granted in full as to fees, and granted in part as to costs; Deft must pay to Plaintiff $197,869.00 in attorney's fees and $7,971.86 in costs for a total of � 36;205,840.86; granting 219 Motion to Conform Pleadings to the Proof; upon deft's payment of the Judgment in full, Plaintiff must assign his mortgage on the Rest in Peace Cemetery to Defendant. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/7/09. (mkf)
March 25, 2009 227 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Virgil W Shelton in the amount of $675,000 plus punitive damages in the amount of $1,000,000.00, for a total award of $1,675,000.00, plus pre-judgment interest at the rate of 6% and post-judgment interest at the rate of.72% per annum until paid, this interest only to be applied to the $675,000.00 compensatory damages award. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/25/09. (bkp)
March 24, 2009 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 217 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/24/09. (bkp)
March 9, 2009 207 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Virgil W Shelton against Kennedy Funding Inc re 203 Jury Verdict in the amount of $675,000.00 and $1,000,000.00 in punitive damages for a total award of $1,675,000.00, plus pre-judgment interest and post-judgment interest applied to the jury verdict at the rate of.72% per annum until paid in the amount of $675,000.00 only; attorney's fees will be determined pursuant to Local Rule 54.1(a). Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/9/09. (bkp)
March 6, 2009 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re issue as to whether the statute of frauds applies to the alleged contract in this case. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/6/09. (mkf)
March 5, 2009 197 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to counsel re 194 MOTION to Exclude Evidence of Plantiff's Lost Profits. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/5/09. (bkp)
March 4, 2009 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 173 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence of KFI's Net Worth and Financial Stability as Irrelevant and Prejudicial filed by Kennedy Funding Inc. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/4/09. (bkp)
February 25, 2009 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 165 Motion in Limine; granting 167 Motion in Limine; granting 169 Motion in Limine; denying 170 Motion in Limine; denying 171 Motion in Limine; denying 172 Motion in Limine; denying 173 Motion in Limine with deft to be required to provide pltf a detailed financial statement which defense counsel will confirm that they will bring to trial by 4:00 p.m. on Friday, February 27, 2009; denying 174 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/25/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. Kennedy Funding Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil W Shelton
Represented By: Anthony Bryce Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennedy Funding Inc
Represented By: Katherine M. Hingtgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?