Massey, et al v. Wyeth Inc, et al
Plaintiff: Betty L Massey, Ethel M Moore, Pixie D Rippy and Laura Shelton
Defendant: Wyeth Inc, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc, Charlotte Magnussen, Jaime R Ungo, Angela Furr, Michael R Duckworth and Does
Cross_claimant: Michael R Duckworth
Cross_defendant: Wyeth Inc and Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 4:2003cv00712
Filed: March 23, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that every plaintiff other than the first named plaintiff is DROPPED from this civil action; the Clerk is directed to send a contemporaneous copy of this Order to the MDL Panel to allow, to the extent possible, fast-tracking of 1407 transfers of these cases back to MDL No. 1507 for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/19/10. (vjt)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A, who have not already done so, to submit updated medical authorization forthwith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/1/10. (bkp)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER designating this non-Arkansas case to proceed with case-specific discovery under Practice and Procedure Order 9. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/23/2010. (mkf)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER ORDER re 8 MOTION to Extend Time to Remedy Fact Sheet Deficiencies; a respone to this letter by way of an addendum to your motion is to be filed by 5 p.m., tomorrow, August 11, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/10/09. (mkf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massey, et al v. Wyeth Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty L Massey
Represented By: John D. Cosmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel M Moore
Represented By: John D. Cosmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pixie D Rippy
Represented By: John D. Cosmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Shelton
Represented By: John D. Cosmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Inc
Represented By: F. Lane Heard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: F. Lane Heard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Magnussen
Represented By: John G. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime R Ungo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Furr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R Duckworth
Represented By: L. Carl Hagwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Michael R Duckworth
Represented By: L. Carl Hagwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Wyeth Inc
Represented By: Michael B. Hewes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael B. Hewes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?