Byrd, et al v. Wyeth Inc, et al

Plaintiff: Jeanette Byrd and Mildred Lyles
Defendant: Wyeth Inc, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc and Does
Case Number: 4:2003cv00927
Filed: March 23, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MDL PRETRIAL ORDER for REMANDED CASES and SUGGESTION of REMAND. (Note: Judge Wilson's Order of 12/6/2010 (Doc. 2501) amended to add a paragraph on page 5 referencing the fourth Bellwether trial that resulted in a jury verdict in favor of Wyeth (the only defendant)). Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/13/2011. (kdr)
April 1, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A, who have not already done so, to submit updated medical authorization forthwith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/1/10. (bkp)
March 23, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER designating this non-Arkansas case to proceed with case-specific discovery under Practice and Procedure Order 9. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/23/2010. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd, et al v. Wyeth Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Byrd
Represented By: John D. Cosmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Lyles
Represented By: John D. Cosmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Inc
Represented By: F. Lane Heard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: F. Lane Heard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?