In Re: Prempro Products et al

Case Number: 4:2003cv01507
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: L Office
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: L

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2014 3299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3287 the Common Benefit Committee's Unanimous Motion for Percentage Allocation of Common Benefit Fund and for Second Disbursement of Funds to the extent set forth in the Order and directing the Trustee to disclose the amount and source of any future deposits to the MDL 1507 Fee and Cost Trust Account to Ralph Cloar within 10 days of the deposit. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/1/2014. (thd)
December 27, 2013 3267 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER/ORDER directing Plaintiff's counsel to respond to the question regarding the percentage of the contingency fee by 5 p.m., Monday, January 6, 2014. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/27/2013. (jak)
August 8, 2012 3119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CANCELLING the August 24, 2012 Status Conference. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/8/12. (vjt)
December 9, 2011 2858 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 2853 MOTION for Order Motion for Revision of Schedule re Daubert Challenge Concerning Short-Term Use and Lobular Cancer filed by Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc, Wyeth Inc. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/9/11. (kpr)
April 1, 2011 2620 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-211) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the action listed in this Order now pending in the Northern District of Illinois is now transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas as part of MDL-1507. Signed by the Clerk of the MDL Panel on 4/1/2011. (dmn)
March 14, 2011 2605 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-209) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the 1 action listed in this Order now pending in the Northern District of Mississippi, is now transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas as part of MDL-1507. Signed by the Clerk of the MDL Panel on 3/14/2011. (thd)
March 10, 2011 2601 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/18/2011 to begin at 08:15 AM and end at 9:45 AM before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/10/11. (vjt)
February 11, 2011 2571 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 204) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the one (1) action listed in this Order now pending in the District of Minnesota is transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas as part of MDL-1507. Signed by Clerk of the MDL Panel on 2//11/2011. (thd)
January 24, 2011 2548 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Panel). Signed by the Clerk of Panel on 1/24/2011.(thd) (Docket text modified on 1/25/2011 to correct a typographical error.) (thd)
January 13, 2011 2539 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MDL PRETRIAL ORDER for REMANDED CASES and SUGGESTION of REMAND. (Note: Judge Wilson's Order of 12/6/2010 (Doc. 2501) amended to add a paragraph on page 5 referencing the fourth Bellwether trial that resulted in a jury verdict in favor of Wyeth (the only defendant)). Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/13/2011. (thd)
November 15, 2010 2468 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-191) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the 87 actions listed in this Order now pending in the Southern District of Illinois (1); Western District of Louisiana (1); District of Minnesota (83); Eastern District of Missouri (17); Northern District of Mississippi (7); Eastern District of Missouri (1); Southern District of Texas (1) Signed by Clerk of the MDL Panel on 11/15/2010. (thd)
May 19, 2010 2276 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER pursuant to May 19, 2010 Telephone Conference re: E-only Schedule; the Court's 2270 Order will be modified to extend the deadline for Plaintiffs to file motion, designate experts, and disclose expert reports until June 9, 2010, vice June 2, 2010; the Order also will provide that only Wyeth will be involved in the consideration at this point. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/19/10. (mkf)
May 13, 2010 2270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2250 Motion for Scheduling Order to consider evidence regarding a scientifically supported causal link between estrogen-only therapy and breast cancer. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/13/2010. (mkf)
May 3, 2010 2263 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel allowing counsel to submit topics they wish to be on the agenda for the May 14, 2010 status conference by 5 p.m. Monday, May 10, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/3/2010. (mkf)
April 15, 2010 2254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; April 22, 2010 Status Conference is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/15/2010. (mkf)
April 13, 2010 2253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER To Implement PPO-6; Rex Kyle, President of Bank of the Ozarks Trust & Wealth Management Division, is appointed as Trustee of the MDL 1507 Common Benefit Fee and Cost Account. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/13/2010. (mkf)
April 12, 2010 2252 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel allowing counsel to submit topics they wish to be on the agenda for the April 22, 2010 status conference by 5 p.m. on Monday, April 19, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/12/2010. (mkf)
March 29, 2010 2241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; any dropped plaintiffs in the cases identified in Exhibit A who filed lawsuits in compliance with the order dropping plaintiffs may, w/i 30 days of this Order, file amended complaints, or motions for leave to file amended complaints, to modify the newly filed complaints solely to add Wyeth LLC as a defendant. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/29/2010. (mkf)
March 23, 2010 2239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Amended General Order 54 setting out the rules for all lawyers and staff affiliated with this case regarding electronic devices; Counsel are reminded that they are to bring a copy of this Order to the Courthouse the first day of any scheduled hearing. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/23/10. (mkf)
March 19, 2010 2235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2210 2214 2223 Motions to Remand. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/19/10. (mkf)
March 8, 2010 2225 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel allowing counsel to submit topics they wish to be on the agenda for the March 19, 2010 status conference by 5 p.m., Monday, March 15, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/8/10. (mkf)
March 2, 2010 2222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER scheduling Diane Laferrara v. Wyeth, et al, 4:04-CV-02271, for trial commencing on July 20, 2010, if Helen Hill v. Wyeth, 4:05-CV-00546 WRW, settles; a scheduling order will be filed forthwith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/2/2010. (mkf)
February 8, 2010 2202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; based on the requests of the parties, the February 19, 2010, Status Conference is CANCELLED.. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/8/10. (mkf)
February 5, 2010 2200 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER to attorney Littlepage regarding Mr. Morris' availability at the July 20, 2010 punitive damages trial in Scroggin v. Wyeth, et al (4:04-cv-01169), or alternatively, the Hill trial (4:05-cv-00546). Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/5/10. (mkf)
February 3, 2010 2199 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER advising counsel to be prepared to go to trial on either Scroggin v. Wyeth, et al (4:04-cv-01169) or Hill v. Wyeth, et al (4:05-cv-00546) the morning of July 20, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/3/10. (mkf)
January 13, 2010 2191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising counsel regarding award of reasonable attorneys' fees to defense counsel for filing Rule 25 motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/13/2010. (mkf)
January 12, 2010 2190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - the January 22, 2010 Status Conference is CANCELLED; the next Status Conference is scheduled for February 19, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/12/2010. (mkf)
November 20, 2009 2170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Status Conference dates for 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/20/09. (mkf)
November 9, 2009 2163 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER/ORDER to Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel allowing counsel to submit topics they wish to be on the agenda for the November 20, 2009 hearing by 5 p.m., Monday, November 16, 2009.. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/9/09. (mkf)
November 2, 2009 2159 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER tentatively scheduling the next bellwether trial for June 8, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/2/09. (mkf) Modified on 11/3/2009 to correct typographical error. (mkf)
October 1, 2009 2151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 2148 MOTION for Protective Order and Emergency Telephone Conference, filed by Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc, Wyeth Inc; if issue set forth in this motion is not resolved by 3 p.m. tomorrow, the Court will have a telephone conference regarding the pending dispute. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/1/09. (mkf)
September 28, 2009 2147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Status Conference scheduled for October 2, 2009 is CANCELLED, based on the parties' position that there are no issues ripe for discussion this month. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/28/09. (mkf)
September 25, 2009 2146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 2044 Motion to Compel directing Solvay to deliver to Plaintiffs a list of the ten highest prescribers of Prometrium for each state for the current calendar year, including their business or professional address, based on the data in Solvay's possession and subject to the Superseding Confidentiality Order; Pltfs are directed to pay the costs incurred in preparing and providing the list; the remainder of Pltfs' Motion to Compel is withdrawn. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/25/09. (mkf)
September 21, 2009 2145 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER/ORDER to Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel allowing counsel to submit topics they wish to be on the agenda for the October 2, 2009 hearing by 5 p.m., Monday, September 28, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/21/09. (mkf)
September 2, 2009 2135 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER to attorneys Littlepage and Troyer regarding Pltfs' Motion to Compel (Doc. No. 2044). Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/2/09. (mkf)
August 31, 2009 2134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 2092 2094 Motions to Compel. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/31/09. (mkf)
August 19, 2009 2130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling the August 28, 2009 Status Conference. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/19/09. (mkf)
August 17, 2009 2129 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel allowing counsel to submit topics they wish to be on the agenda for the August 28, 2009 hearing, by 5 p.m. Monday, August 24, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/17/09. (mkf)
July 29, 2009 2123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2122 Motion for Clarification; the scope of the July 23, 2009 Order is intended to cover only the 1,520 documents identified by Plaintiffs in their motion; request for an extension of time is denied. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/29/09. (mkf)
July 24, 2009 2120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2060 Motion to Intervene by New York Times Company; granting 2063 Motion for Access to Discovery Materials Involving Ghostwriting Practices; granting 2076 Motion to Intervene by New York Times Company; granting 2076 Motion to S et Aside Defendant's Designation of Confidentiality ; granting 2090 Motion to De-Designate the Confidential Designation of Materials Involving Ghostwriting; denying 2101 Motion to Compel; granting 2115 2117 Motions for Joinder; the granting of the motions regarding de-designation of confidential "ghostwriting" documents becomes effective at 5 p.m., Friday, July 31, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/24/09. (mkf)
July 13, 2009 2106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: WHI Extension Study Data, granting 2049 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/13/09. (mkf)
July 1, 2009 2089 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2069 Motion to Dismiss; the request for dismissals is denied at this time, and the request for sanctions is granted as set out in this Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/1/09. (mkf)
June 15, 2009 2073 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; pltfs' plenary response to Defendant Wyeth's 2069 MOTION to Dismiss and For Sanctions re Failure to Serve Complete Fact Sheets, should be filed by 11:00 a.m. (C.S.T.), Wednesday, June 24, 2009; Wyeth's response to 2063 MOTION for Access to Discovery Materials filed by PLOS Medicine, and 2060 MOTION to Intervene filed by PLOS Medicine, should be filed by the same deadline. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/15/09. (mkf)
May 12, 2009 2041 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling the May 29, 2009 Status Conference. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/12/09. (mkf)
May 7, 2009 2038 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising that the Court plans to cancel the Status Conference currently set for May 29, 2009; any objection should be filed by 5 p.m., Monday, May 11, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/7/09. (mkf)
April 20, 2009 2035 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1952 Discovery Plan Order; generic discovery after the deadline will be the exception, not the norm; Plaintiffs' request pursuant to 2033 Letter is GRANTED; Wyeth is directed to provide Plaintiffs with the requested call notes. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/20/09. (mkf)
April 16, 2009 2032 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER directing attorney Littlepage to provide a response to the Court's inquiry by noon, Friday, April 17, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/16/09. (mkf)
April 15, 2009 2030 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 1959 Motion to Dismiss; for all the cases listed in Exhibit A (which were unintentionally left out of the February 27, 2009 1993 Order), a reasonably adequate Fact Sheet must be served on defendants by 5 p.m., Tues day, May 5, 2009, and if such Fact Sheet is not submitted, the case will be dismissed with prejudice. If there are motions for voluntary dismissal filed during this 20 day period, in any of the cases subject to this Order, such dismissals must be with prejudice, absent highly unusual circumstances. Additionally, Plaintiffs' counsel will not be permitted to withdraw as counsel during this 20 day period. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/15/09. (mkf)
April 14, 2009 2028 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 2027 Letter filed by Counsel Plaintiff Lead. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/14/09. (mkf)
April 13, 2009 2026 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPERCEDING PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER 9 (Case Specific Discovery). Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/13/09. (mkf)
April 7, 2009 2024 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising that the April 24, 2009 Status Conference is CANCELLED, based on the parties' position that there are no issues ripe for discussion this month. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/7/09. (mkf)
March 24, 2009 2019 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re Plaintiffs' Request for Additional Call Notes; response to this inquiry should be filed by 5 p.m., Tuesday, April 7, 2009; Defendants may respond to Plaintiffs' submission by 5 p.m., Tuesday, April 14, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/24/09. (mkf)
March 3, 2009 1999 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CANCELLING the March 20, 2009 Status Conference; a telephone conference commencing at 8:30 a.m., Friday, March 20, 2009, will be held to address the generic discovery issues involving Mr. Urbanczyk and Mr. Williams. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/3/09. (mkf)
February 27, 2009 1994 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: General Order 54 advising attorneys of the rules regarding electronics in the courthouse. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/27/09. (mkf)
February 24, 2009 1990 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 1953 MOTION to Establish Fee and Cost Trust Account; the Court is advising counsel to be prepared to address the specific duties to be required of an appointed trustee in this case at the Status Conference, Friday, February 27, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/24/09. (mkf)
February 19, 2009 1986 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re Trustee of Plaintiffs Trust Account; Mr. Heard is directed to respond, as soon as possible, to Ms. Littlepage's suggestion that Defendants pay the expense of the trustee. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/19/09. (mkf)
January 27, 2009 1952 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY PLAN ORDER setting September 1, 2009, as the generic discovery deadline for Wyeth and Pfizer; parties to update Court PPO 9 remands at the June 26, 2009 Status Conference; directing depositions in PPO 9 designated cases to be completed by A ugust 17, 2009; directing parties to address the numerous voluntary dismissals and PPO 8 dismissals in a "very brief" responses to be filed by 5 p.m., Friday, February 13, 2009; setting a September 1, 2009 deadline for non-breast cancer case discovery; directing discovery to "forthwith commence" on non-Wyeth and non-Pfizer defendants. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/27/09. (mkf)
January 16, 2009 1949 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the joint motions to dismiss certain defendants pending in the cases listed in Exhibit A; accordingly, American College of Physicians, the National Committee for Quality Assurance and the American College of Gynecologists and Obstetricians are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/16/09. (mkf)
January 13, 2009 1948 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Fact Sheet procedures. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/13/09. (mkf)
December 4, 2008 1923 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: 2009 Status Conference Schedule. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/04/08. (mkf)
November 21, 2008 1916 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 1889 Motion to Compel; denying 1892 Motion to Compel; granting 1894 Motion to Amend; Pltfs' are permitted to file the Amended Master Complaint, attached to 1894 Motion, by 5 p.m., Wednesday, November 26, 2008; December 12, 2008, Status Conference is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/21/08. (mkf)
November 20, 2008 1914 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPERCEDING ORDER re 1888 Order identifying PPO-9 cases ready to proceed with case-specific discovery. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/20/08. (mkf)
November 4, 2008 1888 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER identifying additional cases to be selected for PPO-9 discovery; thirty Arkansas cases and one hundred non-Arkansas cases to proceed with case-specific discovery depositions. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/4/08. (mkf)
October 2, 2008 1868 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 145 insofar as it relates to the three actions identified in this Order; these actions will be included on an upcoming conditional transfer order in MDL-1507. Signed by Clerk of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mkf) (Docket text modified on 10/3/2008 to correct typographical errors.) (thd)
September 26, 2008 1865 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling the Status Conference for next week. The Court will hear argument via telephone conference, and the Parties are directed to designate a person to be on the telephone conference by 5:00 p.m. on 9/30/2008. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/26/2008. (thd)
September 11, 2008 1858 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-146) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the 35 actions (see image for complete listing) listed in the Order, now pending in Middle District of Florida (3); District of Minnesota (26); Eastern District of Missouri (4); District of North Dakota (1); and Southern District of Texas (1), are transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas as part of MDL #1507. Signed by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mkf)
September 8, 2008 1857 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-145) as it relates to two actions (see image for listing) listed in this Order now pending in the District of Minnesota; these actions are to be transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas to become part of MDL-1507. Signed by Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mkf)
February 7, 2008 1714 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-126) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that two actions (1) District of Minnesota C.A. No. 0:07-4948 Kathy Barber v. Wyeth Inc, et al and (1) District of North Dakota C.A. No. 3:07-117 Eloise Kleven, et al v. Wyeth Inc, et al, are transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas as part of MDL 1507. Signed by Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter / Service List)(mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Prempro Products et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?