Townsend v. Wyeth Inc, et al

Case Number: 4:2004cv00265
Filed: March 12, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MDL PRETRIAL ORDER for REMANDED CASES and SUGGESTION of REMAND. (Note: Judge Wilson's Order of 12/6/2010 (Doc. 2501) amended to add a paragraph on page 5 referencing the fourth Bellwether trial that resulted in a jury verdict in favor of Wyeth (the only defendant)). Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/13/2011. (kdr)
April 1, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A, who have not already done so, to submit updated medical authorization forthwith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/1/10. (bkp)
March 23, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER designating this non-Arkansas case to proceed with case-specific discovery under Practice and Procedure Order 9. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/23/2010. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend v. Wyeth Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?