Arkansas Hospice Inc v. Hospice Home Care, et al

Plaintiff: Arkansas Hospice Inc
Defendant: Hospice Home Care Inc, Hospice Home Care of Pine Bluff PLLC, Cecilia Troppoli, Theresa Travis and Lisa Thompson
Intervenor: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2004cv00419
Filed: April 26, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2011 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice as to the Relator pursuant to the terms and conditions of the Settlement Agreement, and incorporating the Settlement Agreement into this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/16/11. (kpr)
March 15, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file a Status Report with the Court on or before March 22, 2011. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/14/11. (kpr)
January 13, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling the jury trial set for January 18, 2011 and directing the parties to submit a status report in 30 days, if the case has not been resolved. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/13/11. (bkp)
April 26, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/26/10. (bkp)
May 20, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 68 Notice of Election to Intervene filed by United States of America directing that the Relator's Complaint, the Government's Notice of Election to Intervene in Part and to Decline to Intervene in Part, and this Order be unsealed; that Relator serve its complaint upon defts within 120 days; the other papers in this matter to remain under seal. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/20/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arkansas Hospice Inc v. Hospice Home Care, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas Hospice Inc
Represented By: David Lawrence Ivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospice Home Care Inc
Represented By: Danny R. Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospice Home Care of Pine Bluff PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecilia Troppoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States of America
Represented By: Michael F. Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?