Nicholas v. Pharmacia & Upjohn et al
Plaintiff: George Nicholas, Gina Nicholas, Joseph Nicholas, Frank Nicholas, John Nicholas and Andrea Nicholas
Defendant: Pharmacia & Upjohn Company, Pfizer Inc, Wyeth and Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 4:2004cv00833
Filed: March 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED MDL PRETRIAL ORDER for REMANDED CASES and SUGGESTION of REMAND. (Note: Judge Wilson's Order of 12/6/2010 (Doc. 2501) amended to add a paragraph on page 5 referencing the fourth Bellwether trial that resulted in a jury verdict in favor of Wyeth (the only defendant)). Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/13/2011. (kdr)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MDL PRETRIAL ORDER for REMANDED CASES and SUGGESTION of REMAND. The Court suggests that the cases listed in Exhibit A are ripe for remand by the JPML to the transferor courts for further proceedings, including final disposition. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on December 6, 2010. (dmn)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A, who have not already done so, to submit updated medical authorization forthwith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/1/10. (bkp)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER designating this non-Arkansas case to proceed with case-specific discovery under Practice and Procedure Order 9. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/23/2010. (mkf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholas v. Pharmacia & Upjohn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia & Upjohn Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth
Represented By: Edward F. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Edward F. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Nicholas
Represented By: Brian S. Campf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Nicholas
Represented By: Brian S. Campf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Nicholas
Represented By: Brian S. Campf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Nicholas
Represented By: Brian S. Campf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nicholas
Represented By: Brian S. Campf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Nicholas
Represented By: Brian S. Campf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?