Rille, et al v. Electronic Data, et al

Case Number: 4:2004cv00986
Filed: September 17, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2016 391 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The concluding paragraph of 387 Order contained a clerical error. Relators are awarded $3,738.50 in costs for the work done by Wilson, Engstrom, Corum, andCoulter. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/19/2016. (thd)
September 28, 2012 358 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 256 Realtors' Motion for Attorney Fees and 345 Realtors' Motion for Determination of Share of Settlement Proceeds without prejudice. The parties are directed to inform the Court of the resolution of the California case within 2 weeks of the fact. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/28/2012. (mcz)
May 15, 2012 346 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 343 Sun Microsystem's Motion for Leave to File a Reply; any reply must be submitted by 5:00 p.m., Friday, May 25, 2012; granting 344 Relators' Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Determination of Relators' Share of Settlement Proceeds. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/15/12. (vjt)
January 30, 2012 325 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 249 Motion to Dismiss; denying 252 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/30/12. (kpr)
May 5, 2011 290 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 255 Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Versions of Various Papers Regarding Relators' Motion for Award of Statutory Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/5/11. (kpr)
April 22, 2011 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 266 Motion to Seal Document ; denying as to the sealing of the Consolidated Opposition to the Motions to Dismiss 270 . Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/22/11. (kpr)
March 18, 2011 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the joint request of the parties on March 11, 2011, relating to scheduling of motions, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/18/11. (kpr)
February 28, 2011 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 246 Motion and directing the Relators to file a motion for an award of statutory attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses no later than March 25, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/28/11. (kpr)
February 8, 2011 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 242 Stipulation of Dismissal and dismissing the case with prejudice as to the relators and with prejudice as to the United States, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/8/11. (bkp)
January 21, 2011 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 239 Assent Motion to Extend The Stay through Januaryr 28, 2011 filed by Sun Microsystems Inc, United States of America and directing the parties to provide a status report on or before January 28, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/21/11. (bkp)
January 11, 2011 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 236 Status Report filed by Sun Microsystems Inc and directing the parties to provide a status report to the Court on or before January 21, 2011. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/11/11. (bkp)
November 5, 2010 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 229 Motion to Stay and staying the case until December 3, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/5/10. (bkp)
August 18, 2010 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 191 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint in Intervention. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/18/10. (bkp)
May 13, 2010 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 166 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; and denying 178 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/13/10. (bkp)
January 25, 2010 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 138 Motion for Discovery; granting 147 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/25/10. (bkp)
October 15, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 120 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/15/09. (bkp)
August 12, 2009 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 116 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/12/09. (bkp)
March 16, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re limit on number of interrogatories. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/16/09. (bkp)
October 28, 2008 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss deft's counterclaims. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/28/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rille, et al v. Electronic Data, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?