Rille, et al v. PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, et al

Case Number: 4:2004cv00988
Filed: September 17, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2012 263 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 150 Motion for Attorney Fees without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/27/12. (kpr) (The correct document was substituted as the attachment on 9/27/2012, per instructions from Chambers.) (thd).
September 19, 2011 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 177 Motion for Order; denying 187 Motion to Dismiss. The Court finds that Relators are entitled to 15% of the $3.84 million settlement with Comstor. Relators will receive 17% of the $44.16 million settlement with Cisco ($7,507,200), and 15% of the $3.84 million settlement with Comstor ($576,000). Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/19/11. (kpr)
May 17, 2011 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 216 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/17/11. (kpr)
May 3, 2011 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 190 MOTION for Order to Admit Stanley M. Gibson and Ryan S. Mauck as Counsel Pro Hac Vice for Relators filed by Neal Roberts, Norman Rille. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/3/11. (kpr)
April 12, 2011 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 176 Motion to Seal Unredacted Versions of Various Papers Regarding Relators' Motion for Determination of Relators' Share of Settlement Proceeds and directing the Clerk of this Court to file under seal paper copies of the unredacted memorandum supporting the motion, and the following exhibits to the memorandum: 3-8, 10, 12, 17, 21, 24 and 27. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/12/11. (kpr)
April 11, 2011 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Relators to submit an unredacted version of the Time Records for an in camera review within 14 days of the date of this Order. The Government is directed to file a short position statement regarding Relators' assertion of a joint prosecution privilege within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/11/11. (kpr)
April 6, 2011 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 172 Motion to Seal Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Objections to Redacted Time Entries in support of the Relators' Fee Petition. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/6/11. (kpr)
March 28, 2011 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to try to reach an agreement as to Relators' share of the settlement and that, if an agreement cannot be reached, the motion for a determination of the amount of the Relators' share must be filed no later than 5:00 p.m., Friday, April 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/28/11. (kpr)
March 15, 2011 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 149 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/15/11. (kpr)
March 10, 2011 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 157 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Relators' Motion for Award of Statutory Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses 14 days after this Court rules on the Relators' entitlement to a share of the settlement between the United States and Cisco; and granting 160 161 162 Motions for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of William A. Roberts, III, Roderick Thomas, and Mark B. Sweet for defts. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/10/11. (kpr)
September 30, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 143 Stipulation of Dismissal: The case is dismissed with prejudice as to the relators and with prejudice as to the United States to the extent of the "Covered Conduct" in the Settlement Agreement and otherwise without prejudice as to the United States, the United States and deft Cisco each will bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/30/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rille, et al v. PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?