Rille, et al v. Roberts, et al

Case Number: 4:2004cv00989
Filed: September 17, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2012 231 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing HP to direct all fees and costs, less those for local counsel, into the Court's registry. The Clerk of the Court is directed to deposit the money into an interest bearing account pending further orders of the Court. Local counsel should be paid promptly. The funds deposited into the Court's registry may be released following the conclusion of the California case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/16/12. (kpr)
December 21, 2011 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 203 Motion to Compel; granting 211 Motion to Deposit Funds and directing the Government to deposit the $1.89 million (less local counsel's fee) into the Court's registry. The Clerk is directed to deposit the money into an interest-bearing account pending further orders from the Court. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/21/11. (kpr)
October 5, 2011 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 146 Motion for Attorney Fees. Relators are awarded $861,485 in attorneys' fees and $78,542 in costs. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/5/11. (kpr)
June 27, 2011 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending time for Hewlett-Packard to respond to the 146 MOTION for Attorney Fees Relators' Motion for Award of Statutory Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses Pursuant to 31 U.S.C. Section 3730(d) filed by Neal Roberts, Norman Rille until July 7, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/27/11. (kpr)
May 5, 2011 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 145 Motion to Seal Unredacted Versions of Various Papers re Relators' Motion for Award of Statutory Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/5/11. (kpr)
May 3, 2011 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 149 MOTION for Order to Admit Stanley M. Gibson and Ryan S. Mauck as Counsel Pro Hac Vice for Relators filed by Neal Roberts, Norman Rille. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/3/11. (kpr)
February 24, 2011 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 135 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/23/11. (kpr)
February 22, 2011 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 136 MOTION to Seal Attachment #9/Exhibit "H" to the 134 Reply to Response to Motion and to remove it from public record. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/22/11. (bkp)
January 28, 2011 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 128 Motion to Seal Exhibits to the United States's 127 Response to Motion for Determination of Realtor's Share of the Settlement of the Proceeds of the Case Under Seal. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/28/11. (bkp)
October 13, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 120 Motion to Seal and directing the Clerk to file under seal an unredacted version of Reply Memorandum and Exhibits 26 through 30 and 32 through 33 thereto. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/13/10. (bkp)
September 17, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 107 Motion to Seal Document and directing the Clerk to remove Exhibit 23 from the electronic docket and to file the paper copies of Exhibit 23 (Attachment No. 26 to Doc. No. 103) under seal. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/17/10. (bkp)
September 15, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 104 Motion to Seal Document and directing the Clerk to file the paper copies of Exhibits 2 through 7 and Exhibit 10 under seal. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/15/10. (bkp)
August 31, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 95 Stipulation of Dismissal dismissing the case with prejudice as to the relators and with prejudice as to the United States to the extent of the "Covered Conduct" in the Settlement Agreement and without prejudice otherwise as to the United States. Each party with bear its own costs. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/31/10. (bkp)
July 19, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 91 Motion to Stay through and including August 30, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/19/10. (bkp)
April 16, 2010 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 89 parties' joint Motion to Stay and staying this case until July 16, 2010; and directing parties to file a status report with the Court by 5 p.m., July 16, 2010, to inform the Court whether the case has settled. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/16/10. (bkp)
October 23, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Motion to Stay staying litigation through and including January 15, 2010; and directing the parties to file a status report with the Court by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, January 15, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/23/09. (bkp)
July 27, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 79 Assent Motion to Stay filed by United States of America ; Case stayed through and including October 15, 2009; the parties are directed to file a status report with the Court by 5:00 p.m. on October 15, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/27/09. (mkf)
April 24, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 73 Motion to Stay and staying this litigation through and including July 23, 2009; parties are directed to file a status report with the Court by 5:00 p.m. on July 23, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/24/09. (bkp)
January 26, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 70 Assent Motion to Stay filed by United States of America; the parties are directed to file a status report with the Court by 5:00 p.m. on April 23, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/26/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rille, et al v. Roberts, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?