Scroggin v. Wyeth et al

Case Number: 4:2004cv01169
Filed: October 8, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2010 739 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice by reason of settlement. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/22/10. (bkp)
March 2, 2010 735 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 733 Motion for Reconsideration; finding as moot 734 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/2/2010. (mkf)
February 5, 2010 730 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER to attorney Littlepage regarding Mr. Morris' availability at the July 20, 2010 punitive damages trial in Scroggin v. Wyeth, et al (4:04-cv-01169), or alternatively, the Hill trial (4:05-cv-00546). Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/5/10. (mkf)
February 3, 2010 729 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER advising counsel to be prepared to go to trial on either Scroggin v. Wyeth, et al (4:04-cv-01169) or Hill v. Wyeth, et al (4:05-cv-000546) the morning of July 20, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/3/10. (mkf)
November 2, 2009 723 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER tentatively scheduling a punitive damages re-trial for Tuesday, February 2, 2010, at 1:30 p.m., through Friday, February 5, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/2/09. (mkf)
February 8, 2008 501 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting ddls for submissions by counsel regarding time used and time left. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/8/08. (mkf)
February 6, 2008 479 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding time used and time left for presentation of evidence and trial of this case. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/6/08. (mkf)
February 5, 2008 457 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Plaintiff, over the objection of Defendant, to use Slide 97 in opening statement, assuming it can be verified by evidence during the trial; Slides 55 through 58 may not be used during opening statements, although they may become admissible as evidence develops during the trial. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/5/08. (mkf)
February 4, 2008 455 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to personally serve the attached Order on Dr. Irving Kuperman; when service has been completed, the Marshals Service is further directed to file an Affidavit of Service with the Clerk's Office. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/4/08. (Attachments: # 1 Order Directing Appearance)(mkf)
February 1, 2008 454 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Dr. Irving Kuperman to appear at 8:45 a.m. on Friday, February 8, 2008, and to remain until his testimony is completed. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/1/08. (Attachments: # 1 Fax Confirmation Report)(mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scroggin v. Wyeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?