Kelley, et al v. Wyeth Inc, et al

Case Number: 4:2004cv01314
Filed: November 1, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 16 Order on Motion to Seve; any dropped plaintiffs in the cases identified in Exhibit A who filed lawsuits in compliance with the order dropping plaintiffs may, w/i 30 days of this Order, file amended complaints, or motions for leave to file amended complaints, to modify the newly filed complaints solely to add Wyeth LLC as a defendant. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/29/2010. (mkf)
January 21, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Sever; every plaintiff other than the first named plaintiff is DROPPED from this civil action; the Clerk is directed to send a contemporaneous copy of this order to the MDL panel to allow, to the extent possible, fast-tracking of 1407 transfers of these cases back to MDL No. 1507 for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/21/10. (mkf)
March 17, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A, who have not already done so, to submit updated medical authorization to Wyeth by 5 p.m., April 17, 2009. Failure to do so may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/17/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley, et al v. Wyeth Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?