Hill v. Wyeth, et al

Case Number: 4:2005cv00546
Filed: April 4, 2005
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2010 425 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 423 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/21/10. (bkp)
April 1, 2010 412 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 411 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Oral Motion for Consolidation of the Hill and Laferrara cases; Plaintiffs' oral motion to consolidate is DENIED. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/1/2010. (mkf)
March 12, 2010 402 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 396 March 4, 2010 Letter regarding designation of experts; Defendants must designate their new expert, if they choose to retain one, by 5 p.m., Thursday, April 8, 2010; Daubert motions, if any, regarding the new expert must be filed by 5 p.m., Thursday, May 13, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/12/10. (mkf)
March 5, 2010 399 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting ddl for all motions to be filed by 5 p.m., Monday, March 29, 2010; responses must be filed by 5 p.m., Wednesday, April 14, 2010. Replies, of no more than five pages each, may be filed by 5 p.m., Monday, April 19, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/5/10. (mkf)
March 4, 2010 396 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 394 Response filed by Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC ; counsel is to advise the Court by 5 p.m., Thursday, March 11, 2010, in plenary and specific detail, which experts are not available and why. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/4/10. (mkf)
March 2, 2010 393 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 391 Motion for Reconsideration; finding as moot 392 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/2/2010. (mkf)
February 5, 2010 388 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER TO attorney Littlepage regarding Mr. Morris' availability at the July 20, 2010 punitivie damages trial in Scroggin v. Wyeth (4:04-cv-01169) or alternatively, the Hill trial (4:05-cv-00546). Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/5/10. (mkf)
February 3, 2010 386 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER advising counsel to be prepared to go to trial on either Scroggin v. Wyeth, et al (4:04-cv-01169) or Hill v. Wyeth, et al (4:05-cv-00546) the morning of July 20, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/3/10. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Wyeth, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?