Culpepper v. Department of Agriculture

Case Number: 4:2006cv00180
Filed: February 6, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:12101 American Disability Act for Handicapped

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 84 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Department of Agriculture, dismissing the complaint of Devonna Culpepper in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 7/7/10. (vjt)
June 2, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 68 Motion to Compel Discovery; pltf's request for attorney's fees re the motion to compel is denied; pltf's 70 Motion in Limine and deft's 71 Motion in Limine are denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 6/2/10. (vjt)
May 19, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to make the necessary preparations for an interpreter who is able to read lips and use Sign Exact English (SEE) for the Court Trial scheduled to begin June 7, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 5/19/10. (vjt)
April 26, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Pltf's Motion to Allow for Additional Discovery; the motion is granted as to taking the deposition of Ms. Ivy, which must be completed no later than 5/14/10; the motion is denied as to additional requests for production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 4/26/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culpepper v. Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?