Welch v. Wyeth et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv00299
Filed: March 8, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2012 341 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 319 Plaintiff's Rule 59 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/24/2012. (thd)
October 22, 2012 336 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT ordering that Sondra J. Welch take nothing on her Complaint and that Judgment be entered in favor of the Defendants, and the Complaint be dismissed. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/22/2012. (dmn)
August 29, 2012 299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding deposition designations. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/29/12. (vjt)
August 27, 2012 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 209 Motion to Exclude; granting 237 Motion for Relief; denying as moot 245 Motion to Exclude; denying 262 Motion for Judgment; denying 273 Motion for Order; denying without prejudice 281 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/27/12. (vjt)
August 8, 2012 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding pretrial rulings: 157 Motion to Bifurcate is denied; 162 Motion to Exclude is moot; 141 Motion to Exclude Testimony is granted in part and denied in part; 149 Order is VACATED IN PART; 161 Motion for Reconsideration is granted in part. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/8/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch v. Wyeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?