Humphries v. Pulaski County Special School District

Case Number: 4:2006cv00606
Filed: May 24, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2011 229 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : For the reasons explained in the Court's post-trial order, the Court enters judgment on the jury's verdict for the District and against Dr. Humphries on her § 1981/§ 1983 Equal Protection claims and her duplicative clai ms under the Arkansas Civil Rights Act. Notwithstanding the verdict, the Court enters judgment for the District and against Dr. Humphries onher breach of-contract claims. The Court dismisses Dr. Humphries's third Amended and Supplemented Complaint, with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/5/11. (hph)
April 28, 2011 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 213 the District's motion for judgment as a matter of law or a new trial; and, denying Dr. Humphries' 217 motion to amend. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/28/2011. (dmn)
April 4, 2011 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER clarifying 186 Clerk's minutes. The bench trial was not concluded on 8/26/2010. The Court held the record open on validity through the jury phase. The Clerk's minutes are clarified to reflect that the bench trial concluded on 12/3/2010 when all the proof on validity had been received by the Court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/4/2011. (thd)
December 1, 2010 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Dr. Sharp to bring electronic devices into the Courthouse with restrictions as noted in the Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/1/2010. (mkf)
November 24, 2010 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding Dr. Sharp's proposed testimony at trial. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/24/2010. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphries v. Pulaski County Special School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?