Leseberg et al v. Wyeth et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv00917
Filed: August 2, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/7/2013. (thd)
March 2, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER attached in Exhibit A, cases designated to proceed with case-specific discovery under Practice and Procedure Order 9.. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/2/12. (kpr)
March 30, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ruling that every plaintiff other than the first named plaintiff, Tessa Leseberg, is DROPPED from this civil action; the Clerk is directed to send a contemporaneous copy of this order to the MDL panel to allow, to the extent possible, fast-tracking of § 1407 transfers of these cases back to MDL No. 1507 for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/30/2010. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leseberg et al v. Wyeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?