Neely v. Arkansas, State of

Case Number: 4:2006cv00953
Filed: August 11, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: John F. Forster
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/6/10. (dac)
September 3, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming 50 Memorandum and Order 58 and further clarifying and developing the Court's rulings by this Order and denying petitioner's motion to admit the proffered affidavit into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/3/10. (bkp)
August 9, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to proffer live witness testimony at the evidentiary hearing to be held on August 18, 2010, addressing whether petitioner's counsel provided constitutionally effective advice in procuring his guilty plea 58 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/9/10. (bkp)
July 27, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting an evidentiary hearing for Wednesday, August 18, 2010, at 9:30 a.m.; directing counsel for the parties to submit and exchange a "Pre-Hearing Information Sheet" prior to the hearing; and to subpoen all witnesses no later than ten days prior to the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/27/10. (bkp)
July 21, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 granting Motion for Reconsideration and ordering an evidentiary hearing to be scheduled by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/21/10. (bkp)
June 15, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 50 Memorandum and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this habeas action with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/15/10. (vjt)
August 26, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Seal Exhibit A to Docket #40 and directing the Clerk to take the necessary steps to place this document under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 8/26/09. (bkp)
April 28, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Larry Neely and directing the Petitioner to file his brief no later than 20 days from this date, with Respondent's response to be due within ten days of the date Petitioner files his brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/28/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neely v. Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?