Cates-Wyles v. Social Security Administration

Case Number: 4:2006cv01514
Filed: October 13, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 29 Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, Pltf's 24 Motion for Attorney's Fees is GRANTED; the Commissioner shall certify and pay to Mr. Alan J. Nussbaum, attorney for Pltf, $14,814.25, as attorney's fees under 42 USC 406(b); Mr. Nussbaum is directed to immediately refund to Pltf, the $6,657.50 awarded to him under the EAJA. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/3/09. (vjt)
November 19, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that 24 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees be granted; that the Commissioner certify and pay to Mr. Alan J. Nussbaum $14,814.25 as attorney's fees under 42 U.S.C. § 40 6(b); and that Mr. Nussbaum immediately refund to Plaintiff the $6,657.50 awarded to him under the EAJA Objections to R&R due 11 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/19/2009. (thd)
February 6, 2008 15 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that the final decision of the Commissioner be reversed and remanded for action consistent with this opinion. This recommended remand would be a "sentence four" remand within the meaning of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and Melkonyan v Sullivan, 501 U.S. 89(1991). Objections to R&R due by 2/20/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/6/2008. (smb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cates-Wyles v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?