St Jude Packaging & Specialties Inc v. World Color Inc
Case Number: 4:2006cv01717
Filed: December 21, 2006
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 125 Motion for Attorney Fees and awarding plaintiff $3,575.57 in costs and $78,358.21 in attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/15/09. (bkp)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER denying 123 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/19/09. (bkp)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 JUDGMENT in favor of St Jude Packaging & Specialties Inc against World Color Inc re 120 121 ; judgment in the principal amount of $539,500.00; prejudgment interest in the amount of $131,994.33 to accrue from June 2, 2009 until judgment i s entered at the rate of $147.81 per day; post judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.47% per annum; St. Jude is entitled to recover its atty's fees and costs upon timely petition for said fees and expenses. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/5/09. (mkf)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER authorizing Mr. Stephen Elston to bring certain electronic devices into the Courthouse beginning Tuesday, June 2 through Thursday, June 4, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/2/09. (bkp)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 LETTER ORDER re 55 MOTION in Limine filed by St Jude Packaging & Specialties Inc. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/1/09. (bkp)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 LETTER ORDER to counsel re motions in limine. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/27/09. (bkp)
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER finding as moot 55 Motion in Limine, as Plaintiff has decided to withdraw its motion. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/5/08. (mkf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St Jude Packaging & Specialties Inc v. World Color Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?