Steinbuch v. Cutler Featured Case

Petitioner: Robert Steinbuch
Respondent: Jessica Cutler
Case Number: 4:2006mc00028
Filed: September 6, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2006 20 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 19 Order. (mkf, )
October 31, 2006 19 Featured Case ORDER re emails listed on the Privilege Log for UALR School of Law email account for R.E. Steinbuch; excluding the emails where the UA asserts a privilege and the July 2, 2006 email, all other emails listed in the privilege log must be produced. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 10/31/06. (mkf, )
October 18, 2006 18 RESPONSE re 16 Order, Regarding Plaintiff's Assertions of Privilege by Jessica Cutler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Notice from University's computer system)(Deere, Beth)
October 3, 2006 17 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 16 Order. (mkf, )
October 3, 2006 16 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to telephone hearing held on Thursday, September 28, 2006, to address concerns over documents ordered produced by the University of Arkansas at Little Rock, Bowen School of Law under a subpoena duces tecum. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 10/3/06. (Copy mailed to Sarah James, General Counsel for Univeristy of Arkansas) (mkf, )
October 2, 2006 15 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 14 Order on Motion to Clarify. (Copy also mailed to Sarah James, General Counsel for University of Arkansas pursuant to instructions from Chambers) (mkf, ) Modified on 10/2/2006 to add docket text. (mkf).
October 2, 2006 14 Featured Case ORDER denying 10 Motion to Clarify . Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 01/2/06. (mkf, )
October 2, 2006 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum on Robert Coates, Director of Human Resources, University of Arkansas at Little Rock, filed by Jessica Cutler. (Deere, Beth)
September 28, 2006 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William R. Wilson Jr: Telephone Conference held on 9/28/2006 re pending motions; counsel for deft Culter to prepare Order for Court's review and signature. (Court Reporter C. Newburg) (maj)
September 27, 2006 12 Featured Case (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Mr. Matthew C. Billips is admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant.Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 09/27/06. (dmm, )
September 25, 2006 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jessica Cutler. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Matthew C. Billips)(Deere, Beth)
September 21, 2006 10 MOTION to Clarify by Robert Steinbuch. (Rosen, Jonathan)
September 21, 2006 9 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 8 Amended Order. (mkf, ) (MODIFICATION: The correct document was substituted as an attachment on 9/27/2006.) (thd)
September 21, 2006 8 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 9/21/06. (mkf, )
September 20, 2006 7 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 6 Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion for Protective Order. (mkf, )
September 20, 2006 6 Featured Case ORDER denying 1 Motion to Quash, finding as moot 1 Motion for Protective Order; UALR is permitted to redact the names of student evaluators if it wishes to do so . Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 9/20/06. (mkf, )
September 18, 2006 5 REPLY to Response to Motion re 1 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order filed by Robert Steinbuch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rosen, Jonathan)
September 12, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge William R. Wilson, Jr. for all further proceedings. Judge James M. Moody no longer assigned to case.(bfw)
September 8, 2006 3 RESPONSE to 1 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order. (bkp, )
September 7, 2006 2 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge James M. Moody for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/7/06.(bfw)
September 6, 2006 1 MOTION to Quash and Motion for Protective Order by Robert Steinbuch; $39.00 filing fee paid/receipt #LIT002342 (jap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinbuch v. Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Steinbuch
Represented By: Jonathan S. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jessica Cutler
Represented By: Beth M. Deere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?