Thompson v. RTC Research & Development LLC et al

Plaintiff: Mystic Thompson
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare LLC and Bayer Corporation
Case Number: 4:2007cv00017
Filed: January 9, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2010 155 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Mystic Thompson against Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC pursuant to 154 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment and awarding to plaintiff the amount of $550.00, subject to the specific terms of the Offer of Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/26/10. (bkp)
August 6, 2009 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 124 139 Motions to Certify Class. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/6/09. (mkf)
February 12, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Motion to Certify Class; denying 86 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/12/09. (bkp)
November 12, 2008 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to submit an amended complaint and submit the proposed jury instructions re 86 Second MOTION to Certify Class Certification REDACTED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/12/08. (bkp)
June 11, 2007 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Stay, which applies to the GTC defts only. The GTC defts and pltf are directed to file a status report on August 1, 2007; and the remaining defts and pltf are still required to file their rule 26(f) report on June 25, 2007. Signed by Judge James M Moody on 6/11/07. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. RTC Research & Development LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare LLC
Represented By: Edwin L. Lowther, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Edwin L. Lowther, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mystic Thompson
Represented By: James Clark Wyly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?