Tyler v. Alltel Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Heather Tyler
Defendant: Alltel Communications Inc and Alltel Corporation
Case Number: 4:2007cv00019
Filed: January 10, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2010 196 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 194 Final Approval Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing all claims brought by Heather Tyler in her Third Amended Complaint against Alltel Corporation and Alltel Communications Inc, with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/7/10. (vjt)
April 19, 2010 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATOR pursuant to 184 Stipulation; the Court approves the selection and appointment of EPIQ Class Action and Claims Solutions Inc, 10300 SW Allen Blvd., Beaverton, OR 97005, as the Settlement Administrator. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/19/10. (vjt)
March 24, 2010 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pltf Heather Tyler is granted permission to file the Third Amended Class Action Complaint attached to 174 Parties' Stipulation to Amend Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(2) filed on March 24, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/24/10. (vjt)
February 23, 2010 173 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying Tyler's 109 Renewed MOTION for Certification of the early disconnect penalty classes; Alltel's 82 Motion to Strike Tyler's Class Allegations, and Tyler's 141 Motion to Strike the expert testimony of Prof. Jerry Hausman are DENIED AS MOOT; Tyler's 76 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint is also DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/23/10. (vjt)
July 17, 2009 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 138 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/17/09. (mkf)
July 16, 2009 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 136 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/16/09. (bkp)
February 13, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Hojoon Hwang, Jeremy Kroger, and Henry Weissmann are hereby admitted to appear before this Court pro hac vice as co-counsel for defendants in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/13/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyler v. Alltel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alltel Communications Inc
Represented By: Tiffany M. Wyatt Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alltel Corporation
Represented By: T. Brent Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Tyler
Represented By: Todd Martin Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?