USA v. $462,926.73 in U S Currency

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $462,926.73 in U S Currency
Case Number: 4:2007cv00497
Filed: May 16, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court DECREE of Forfeiture forfeiting $231,463.36 of deft currency to the United States and $231,463.37 of the deft currency should be returned to the Claimants through their attorney, Lawrence J. Kerr. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/2/08. (bkp)
October 1, 2008 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 12 Settlement Agreement for the United States in the amount of $231,463.36 and the property is condemned as forfeited to the U.S.; the deft property in the amt. of $231,463,37 shall be returned to William Lavenia and Yasmin Gambetti with each side to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/1/08. (bkp)
June 4, 2007 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Stay and suspending the Scheduling Order ddls; and directing the government to file a status report on the ongoing criminal prosecution related to this case on or before October 1, 2007. Signed by Judge James M Moody on 6/4/07. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $462,926.73 in U S Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Karen D. Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $462,926.73 in U S Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?