Fleeger v. Wyeth et al

Plaintiff: Rachel Fleeger
Defendant: Wyeth and Greenstone Ltd
Case Number: 4:2007cv00506
Filed: May 21, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION MINNESOTA SUPREME COURT re 21 Certification Order, re 24 Per Curiam Order; certified question answered in the affirmative.(mkf)
April 21, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER from State of Minnesota Supreme Court regarding the rescheduling of hearings and the admission of attorneys Fox and Heard pro hac vice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/21/09. (mkf)
March 30, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER from State of Minnesota Supreme Court admitting Martin D. Crump pro hac vice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/30/09. (mkf)
March 13, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER from State of Minnesota Supreme Court extending deadline for service and filing of defts' reply brief to April 6, 2009. Signed by Eric J. Magnuson, Chief Justice.(mkf)
February 6, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER from State of Minnesota Supreme Court granting motions of Bayer Corporation, Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, and Product Liability Advisory Council Inc, to serve and file briefs as amicus curiae in support of defendants/appellants; granting motion of the Minnesota Association for Justice to serve and file a brief as amicus curiae in support of plaintiff/respondent. (mkf)
January 26, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER from State of Minnesota Supreme Court granting the request of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp, Barr Laboratories Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticas Inc, King Pharmaceuticals Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Warner-Chilcott, and Watson Laboratories Inc, to serve and file a brief as amicus curiae in this matter in support of defendants, who are filing in the manner of appellants. (mkf) (Docket text modified on 1/26/2009 to remove reference to signature and date.) (thd)
January 15, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court PER CURIAM ORDER re 21 Certification Order. Notice of acceptance of certification from Supreme Court of Minnesota; Defendants' brief is due 30 days from the date of filing of this Order; Plaintiff's brief is due 30 days thereafter and Defendants' may file a reply within 10 days thereafter. Signed by Chief Justice Eric J. Magnuson. (mkf)
November 21, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion; GRANTED as to Motion to Certify Question to the Minnesota Supreme Court; DENIED w/o prejudice as to Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Statute of Limitations. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/21/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleeger v. Wyeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Fleeger
Represented By: Rhett A. McSweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenstone Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?