Davis v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Robert Davis
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2007cv00521
Filed: May 25, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Joint Motion to Dismiss and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/10/09. (bkp)
February 26, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing parties to bring certain electronic equipment into the Courthouse between March 2 and March 6, 2009 pursuant to General Order No. 54. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/26/09. (bkp)
February 18, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 38 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 40 Motion for Protective Order; denying 42 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 50 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/18/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Davis
Represented By: Nelson Gregory Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?