Franklin v. Southern Arkansas University et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth L Franklin
Defendant: Southern Arkansas University, Rankin, Arkansas, State of and Mike Beebe
Case Number: 4:2007cv00561
Filed: June 7, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2007 Featured Case (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Order dated June 12, 2007, the Court directed Plaintiff to submit additional information to the Court not later than July 1, 2007. Plaintiff has failed to respond in any manner to this Court's Order. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to dismiss this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 10/3/2007. (ere)
June 13, 2007 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 3 Order. CORRECTION: The wrong document image was intially attached to to the docket, due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office; the correct document was substituted as the attachment for docket entry 3 . (thd)
June 12, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER holding in abeyance 1 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in forma pauperis, pending the Plaintiff's completion and filing of form AO 240. Plaintiff shall comply with this Order not later than 7/1/2007. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 6/12/2007. (thd) (MODIFICATION: Correct document substituted as an attachment on 6/13/2007.) (thd).
June 7, 2007 MOTION for Discovery filed by Kenneth L Franklin (kjp)
June 7, 2007 2 COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth L Franklin against all defendants. (kjp)
June 7, 2007 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kenneth L Franklin. (kjp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Southern Arkansas University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Arkansas University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Beebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?