Riches v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff Jonathan Lee Riches d/b/a Rockefeller Riches alleges that he is deaf and blind, and was diagnosed with terminal cancer. He sued Walmart Stores Inc. and alleged that defendant hired him under a disability internship program. Plaintiff further alleged that defendant mistreated him on the basis of his disability and maintains an electric chair in the back of the nail department for workers who don\'t cooperate.

Plaintiff: Jonathan Lee Riches
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Case Number: 4:2007cv00780
Filed: August 28, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2007 8
JUDGMENT re 7 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendations; case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; this dismissal constitutes a "STRIKE", as defined by 28 USC 1915(g); the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a)(3), that an ifp appeal from this Judgment and the accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 10/2/07. (mkf)
September 6, 2007 5
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Plaintiff's 4 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss be GRANTED, and that this case be DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE. Recommending that this action Constitute a "strike" as defined by 28 U.S.C. 1915(g); and that the Court Certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an In Forma Pauperis appeal from any Order and Judgment adopting this Recommended Disposition would not be taken in good faith.Objections to R&R due by 9/20/2007. Signed by Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/6/2007. (smb)
September 4, 2007 4
MOTION to Dismiss by Jonathan Lee Riches. (pag)(copy mailed)
August 28, 2007 2 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge William R. Wilson Jr. for all further proceedings. (bfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riches v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Lee Riches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?