Ramsey et al v. Southeastern Employee Benefit Services Inc

Plaintiff: Bill Ramsey and Edith Ramsey
Defendant: Southeastern Employee Benefit Services Inc
Case Number: 4:2007cv00790
Filed: August 31, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2010 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 135 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/20/10. (bkp)
January 7, 2010 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 90 Motion for Leave to File a counterclaim; granting third-party defendants' 111 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Stephens' 120 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/7/10. (bkp)
July 21, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 97 Motion to Stay pending ruling on a dispositive motion and vacating the current trial setting for the week of October 13, 2009. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/21/09. (bkp)
March 13, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/13/09. (bkp)
September 26, 2008 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defts' 45 47 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/26/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramsey et al v. Southeastern Employee Benefit Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Ramsey
Represented By: Nate Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Ramsey
Represented By: Nate Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Employee Benefit Services Inc
Represented By: Sherry P. Bartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?