Kennedy v. Bias et al

Plaintiff: Caz Kennedy
Defendant: John Bias, Charles Leggett and Dream Redic Young
Case Number: 4:2007cv00795
Filed: September 5, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Hot Spring
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 100 Motion for Relief; finding as moot 102 Motion for Ruling. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/14/09. (bkp)
January 5, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 88 Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, Defts' 43 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; Pltf's 90 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal is DENIED; Pltf's remaining claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/5/09. (vjt)
December 12, 2008 88 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that defts' 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment be granted and that plaintiff's claims be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/12/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Bias et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caz Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Leggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dream Redic Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?