Green et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc

Plaintiff: Gloria Green and Warren Green
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc
Case Number: 4:2007cv01055
Filed: October 23, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc against Warren Green re 60 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/15/09. (mkf)
December 23, 2008 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery, Or, In the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss. The Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part & DENIED in part as specified; the Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/23/08. (jct)
November 14, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion to Dismiss as moot and dismissing plaintiff Gloria Green for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/14/08. (bkp)
September 23, 2008 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Compel ; Pltfs are directed to respond to Defendant's discovery requests by 5 p.m., Tuesday, October 7, 2008. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/23/08. (mkf)
February 5, 2008 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/5/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Green
Represented By: Sarah A. Loge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Green
Represented By: Sarah A. Loge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?