Blakley v. Schlumberger

Plaintiff: Relenthis Blakley
Defendant: Schlumberger
Case Number: 4:2007cv01064
Filed: October 29, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Schlumberger Technology Corporation against Relenthis Blakley re 53 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/5/09. (bkp)
February 19, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to Compel; Deft should comply with the directions in this Order by 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, March 5, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/19/09. (mkf)
January 27, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/27/09. (mkf)
December 11, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/11/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakley v. Schlumberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Relenthis Blakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schlumberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?