Bancorp Holdings LLC v. Citigroup Global Markets Inc

Plaintiff: Bancorp Holdings LLC
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc
Case Number: 4:2007cv01113
Filed: November 15, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice pursuant to a settlement by the parties. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/28/09. (bkp)
April 27, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 68 Motion in Limine; granting 69 Motion in Limine; denying 70 Motion in Limine; withdrawing 71 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/27/09. (bkp)
December 9, 2008 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 deft's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 43 pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/9/08. (bkp)
February 8, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting 14 Motion to Substitute Party Heartland Community Bank as the real party in interest, and directing plaintiff to file conventionally with the Clerk of the Court an original and two copies of the amended complaint naming the real party in interest. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/8/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bancorp Holdings LLC v. Citigroup Global Markets Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bancorp Holdings LLC
Represented By: Kenneth R. Shemin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?