Fuller v. Star Fiber Glass

Plaintiff: Carol L Fuller
Defendant: Star Fiber Glass
Case Number: 4:2007cv01120
Filed: November 19, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2009 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 131 Motion for Attorney Fees; Plaintiff is entitled to attorney fees and expenses, paid by Defendant, in the amount of $65,841.78. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/23/09. (mkf)
July 8, 2009 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 133 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Alternative Motion for New Trial Pursuant to Rule 59(a). Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/8/09. (mkf)
June 24, 2009 130 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT re 129 Order and 90 Jury Verdict awarding plaintiff a total of $65,000.00 plus post-judgment interest at the rate of 0.56% per annum until paid. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/24/09. (bkp)
June 3, 2009 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 101 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/3/09. (mkf)
May 26, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re racial harassment policy directing the parties to reply by 5:00 p.m., Friday, May 29, 2009; and Mr. Porter to reply by 5:00 p.m., Tuesday, June 2, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/26/09. (bkp)
May 21, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 90 Jury Verdict in favor of Carol Fuller in the amount of $65,000.00 plus post-judgment interest at the rate of 0.55% per annum until paid; punitive damages issue to be set on the Court's calendar for retrial beginning Tuesday, June 23, 2009 at 9:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/21/09. (bkp)
April 28, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER TO COUNSEL directing them to respond by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, 5/5/2009 regarding 95 Motion. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/28/09. (thd)
April 23, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to a mandatory Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge H. David Young, the parties will be contacted by Judge Young's courtroom deputy for the setting of the Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/23/09. (bkp)
April 9, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion in Limine as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/9/09. (bkp)
April 2, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: General Order 54 regarding electronic devices in the courtroom. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/2/09. (mkf)
March 25, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion for Reconsideration and directing plaintiff to respond to deft's backpay argument as well as deft's motion in limine by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, April 3, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/25/09. (bkp)
March 20, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 31 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/20/09. (bkp)
March 4, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fiber Glass Systems LP directing plaintiff to respond to the motion by noon on Wednesday, March 11, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/4/09. (bkp)
November 4, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER regarding discovery material in this case. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/4/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller v. Star Fiber Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol L Fuller
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Fiber Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?