Choate et al v. Department of Defense et al

Plaintiff: Guy Choate and Jeffrey Rickman
Defendant: Department of Defense, Donald E Jackson, Jr and Belz-Burrow Development Group LLC
Case Number: 4:2007cv01170
Filed: December 5, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $27,776.25 and costs of $639.42, as well as Prejudgment Interest. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/15/09. (bkp)
April 29, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to Counsel re 76 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Guy Choate and directing counsel to file a response by 5:00 p.m., Tuesday, May 5, 2009, if they do not agree with Plaintiffs' position. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/29/09. (bkp)
January 28, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 63 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/28/09. (dac)
November 5, 2008 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiffs pursuant to 52 Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/5/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choate et al v. Department of Defense et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Choate
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Rickman
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E Jackson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belz-Burrow Development Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?